Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR110 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 110


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, A full and purposeful life came to an end with the
 passing of Mary Jo Floyd Hughes of Belk on February 11, 2009, at the
 age of 83; and
 WHEREAS, Born on April 3, 1925, to Earl Kelley and Lillian
 Floyd of Lamar County, the former Mary Jo Floyd grew up on a family
 farm with nine brothers and sisters; she graduated from Deport High
 School in 1942 and went on to work as a bookkeeper and typist for
 First National Bank in Paris, Texas; she later became secretary to
 the manager of Lamar Cotton Oil Company and, in 1946, secretary to
 the district manager of Texas Power and Light Company; and
 WHEREAS, This beloved Texan married Joel B. Hughes on
 December 8, 1946, and the couple lived in Belk, where they owned and
 operated the Hughes Ranch during their 63 rewarding years of
 marriage; the couple were blessed with two children, Bradley and
 Joella, and had the pleasure of welcoming a grandson, Rhett, into
 the family; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Hughes devoted herself to home life for several
 years, raising her children and tending her ranch with the same
 dedication and skill that she brought to her professional
 endeavors; her passion for business administration returned once
 her children reached school age, and she began a 40-year tenure as
 office manager for Fry-Gibbs Funeral Home; and
 WHEREAS, An active member of the community, Mrs. Hughes
 belonged to the Paris Business and Professional Women's Club for 63
 years and served as its president, and she was a congregant of
 Calvary United Methodist Church; in addition, she took an active
 role in the movement for gender equality in the workplace,
 mentoring and encouraging young women to take their place as
 leaders in the business world; the widespread respect she earned
 for her own career achievements was reflected in her selection as
 Business Woman of the Year in 1981; and
 WHEREAS, Mary Jo Hughes approached each of her pursuits with
 unflagging optimism and enthusiasm, bringing happiness to many
 along the way; although she is deeply missed, those fortunate
 enough to have known her will forever treasure their memories of
 time spent in her company; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Mary Jo Floyd Hughes and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her husband, Joel
 B. Hughes; to her children, Bradley W. Hughes and Joella Hughes
 Lucas and her husband, Carl; to her grandson, Rhett Hughes
 Hutchens; to her brother, Kelley W. Floyd; to her special friends,
 Michael Singer, Joyce Kenney, and Elsie Parson; and to her other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Mary Jo Hughes.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 110 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 110 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor