Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR112 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 112


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The loved ones of Cory Lee Ellis of Mount Pleasant
 were greatly saddened by her passing on February 7, 2009, at the age
 of 93; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Mount Pleasant on August 1, 1915, Cory
 Phillips was the daughter of Andrew and Nora Phillips; she married
 Oscar "Jack" Ellis and with him shared a rewarding relationship
 until the time of his passing; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Ellis was the devoted mother of 14 children,
 and with the passing years she had the pleasure of welcoming 55
 grandchildren, 92 great-grandchildren, 64
 great-great-grandchildren, and 4 great-great-great-grandchildren
 into the family; and
 WHEREAS, A kind woman of steadfast faith, Cory Ellis was
 considered the church mother by the congregation of the White Oak
 Church of God in Christ, where she served as treasurer and taught
 Sunday school; she was retired from Snow White Laundry in her
 hometown; and
 WHEREAS, Cory Ellis was a kind and caring woman, and she will
 forever hold a treasured place in the hearts of those fortunate
 enough to have shared in the richness of her life; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Cory Lee Ellis and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of her family: to her children
 and their spouses, John Ersley and Geraldine Ellis, Vernett and
 Nadine Ellis, Albertha and John Thweatte, Alnettia and Tom Carlyle,
 Betty and Jimmy Hall, and Geneva and Duke Hamilton; to her
 daughters-in-law, Mattie and Doris Ellis; to her son-in-law,
 Theartis Brown; to her grandchildren and their extended families;
 and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Cory Lee Ellis.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 112 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 112 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor