E | 05/06/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2871 | |
E | 04/27/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2010 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1627 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1923 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2010 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 619 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 767 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 767 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Filed |