Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1029 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1217 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1217 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1092 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 850 | |
House | 03/20/2009 | Filed |