E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4819 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4314 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2724 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2636 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4355 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | RV#1029 | Journal Page: 4203 |
House | 05/20/2009 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 4203 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Amended | 1-S. Miller | Journal Page: 4203 |
House | 05/20/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4203 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules | Journal Page: 4158 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Postponed | 5/20/09 12:01 AM | Journal Page: 4056 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4056 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 961 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Filed |