Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR130 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 130


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The loved ones of Elbert Patrick Barbee of Paris,
 Texas, were greatly saddened by his passing on March 4, 2009, at the
 age of 52; and
 WHEREAS, A native Texan, Pat Barbee was born on August 24,
 1956, in Paris, to Elbert Elmo Barbee, Jr., and Katheryne Patrick
 Barbee; he attended Paris Junior College, earned a degree from
 Texas Tech University, and pursued graduate studies at Texas A&M
 University--Commerce; and
 WHEREAS, He exchanged vows with the former LeAnn Starnes on
 December 20, 1980, at the First United Methodist Church in Paris,
 and through the years, the couple shared in the joy of welcoming
 three beloved children into their family; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Barbee was employed with Williams Sporting Goods
 for two decades, and after retiring, he went to work at Paris High
 School for five years; and
 WHEREAS, A congregant of First United Methodist Church, he
 participated in local cultural activities through his longtime
 involvement with the Paris Municipal Band, which he also served as
 announcer, and the Paris Community Theatre, which benefited from
 his leadership as president and board member, and from his talent as
 an actor in many productions; and
 WHEREAS, Although his time on earth ended far too soon, Pat
 Barbee will forever hold a treasured place in the hearts of those
 fortunate enough to have shared in his love and friendship; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Elbert Patrick Barbee and extend
 deepest condolences to the members of his family: to his wife, LeAnn
 Elizabeth Starnes Barbee; to his children, Erin Elizabeth, Ethan
 Patrick, and Caitlin Rae Barbee; to his brother, Mike Barbee, and
 his wife, Sarah; to his parents-in-law, the Reverend Ray Starnes
 and Carroll Starnes; to his brothers-in-law, Jeff Starnes and
 Charles Starnes and his wife, Pam; and to his many other relatives
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Pat Barbee.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 130 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 2, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 130 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor