Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR132 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 132


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Mary
 Ammons Fisher of Paris, Texas, who died on March 9, 2009, at the age
 of 89; and
 WHEREAS, Mary Ammons was born in Paris on November 16, 1919,
 to Jess and Augusta "Gussie" Burger Ammons; after graduating from
 Paris High School, she attended Paris Junior College; she worked at
 Camp Maxey during World War II and went on to work at the Veterans
 Administration; in 1948, she was joined in matrimony to George
 Oscar Fisher, Jr., and they enjoyed a long life together until his
 death in 2006; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Fisher worked for the Texas Employment
 Commission and later moved on to the local office of the Social
 Security Administration, where she retired after 15 years of
 service in 1975; she was an active member of Calvary United
 Methodist Church; and
 WHEREAS, Although Mary Fisher will be deeply missed, she will
 be fondly remembered by those whose lives were touched by her
 affection and friendship; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Mary Ammons Fisher and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of her family: to her sons, Brady
 Alan Fisher and George Kim Fisher and his wife, Rhonda; to her
 grandson, Christopher Fisher; to her brother-in-law, T. F. Pretre;
 and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Mary Ammons
 Fisher.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 132 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 2, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 132 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor