E | 04/03/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1093 | |
E | 03/31/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 742 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 988 | |
House | 03/27/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 933 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 703 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 890 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 890 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Filed |