E | 05/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
E | 05/12/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3441 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2197 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3171 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3039 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2192 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2128 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1010 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Filed |