Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR158 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 158


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life filled with joyful times and
 meaningful accomplishments remain to comfort the family and friends
 of Joan Sims Vaughan of Clarksville, who died on March 13, 2009, at
 the age of 80; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Clarksville, Mrs. Vaughan was born on
 January 30, 1929, to Joel Smith Sims and Swann Sivley Sims; she
 earned her bachelor's degree from The University of Texas at
 Austin, where she was a member of Alpha Chi Omega Sorority; and
 WHEREAS, Employed for more than 23 years by the Texas
 Department of Human Services, Mrs. Vaughan retired in 1991 and
 focused her time and talents on volunteer service within her
 community; she was a member of the PRIDE organization, served on the
 fund-raising committee for the Red River County Courthouse
 Restoration Project, and worked with the Chamber of Commerce; her
 dedication to her fellow residents earned her the Historic Red
 River County Chamber of Commerce Citizen of the Year Award in 2004;
 and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Vaughan was dedicated to her family above all
 else; she shared six decades with her husband, James W. "Buddy"
 Vaughan, and she lovingly raised her children, Clare Rainey and
 James Vaughan, Jr.; she was also a longtime, faithful member of the
 First Christian Church and Christian Women's Fellowship; and
 WHEREAS, Joan Vaughan lived a caring and purposeful life, and
 her passing leaves an empty place in the hearts of all those who
 held her dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Joan Sims Vaughan and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her husband, James
 Vaughan; to her son, James Vaughan, Jr., and his wife, Pam; to her
 daughter, Clare Rainey; to her grandchildren, Chris Vaughan and his
 wife, Michele, and Jennifer Vaughan; to her great-granddaughter,
 Madison Vaughan; and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Joan Sims Vaughan.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 158 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 16, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 158 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor