Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR165 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 165


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Gratie
 Mae Potts of Clarksville, who died on March 19, 2009, at the age of
 88; and
 WHEREAS, Born on August 21, 1920, to Berry and Effie Trimble
 Thompson in Clarksville, the former Gratie Mae Thompson was joined
 in marriage with Willie D. Potts, and they enjoyed a rewarding
 relationship until Mr. Potts passed away; the couple raised a
 family of eight children, Janet, Ester, Brenda, Gloria, Samuel,
 Betty, Franklin, and Willie, with the latter three children
 preceding Mrs. Potts in death; through the years, she saw her family
 grow to include 20 grandchildren, 23 great-grandchildren, and 5
 great-great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Potts was a lifelong member of Zion Traveler
 Baptist Church in Clarksville, where she shared in the
 companionship and good cheer of her fellow congregants; and
 WHEREAS, Although she will be deeply missed, Gratie Mae Potts
 leaves her loved ones with a wealth of fond memories of the happy
 times they spent in her company; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Gratie Mae Potts and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her children,
 Janet Porter, Ester Barber, Brenda Wilburn, Gloria Barber, and
 Samuel Potts; to her grandchildren, great-grandchildren, and
 great-great-grandchildren; and to her other relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Gratie Mae Potts.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 165 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 27, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 165 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor