1 | 1 | | H.C.R. No. 169 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Patsy |
---|
6 | 6 | | Bell Rosson of Paris, Texas, who passed away on March 24, 2009, at |
---|
7 | 7 | | the age of 74; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, Born on January 30, 1935, to Horace and Melva |
---|
9 | 9 | | Hawkins Bell in Paris, Patsy Bell graduated from Paris High School |
---|
10 | 10 | | in 1953; she married Walter Rosson on September 24, 1954, and the |
---|
11 | 11 | | couple shared a fulfilling life together until Mr. Rosson passed |
---|
12 | 12 | | away; and |
---|
13 | 13 | | WHEREAS, Mrs. Rosson took great joy in spending time with her |
---|
14 | 14 | | family, which grew to include three children, Jeff, Kenny, and |
---|
15 | 15 | | Luann, four grandchildren, Rachel, Garath, Randi, and Jerimy, and |
---|
16 | 16 | | three great-grandchildren, Evan, Anna, and Tristin; and |
---|
17 | 17 | | WHEREAS, Patsy Rosson is deeply missed, and memories of her |
---|
18 | 18 | | kindness and generosity will long be treasured by all those |
---|
19 | 19 | | fortunate enough to have shared in the richness of her life; now, |
---|
20 | 20 | | therefore, be it |
---|
21 | 21 | | RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
22 | 22 | | hereby pay tribute to the memory of Patsy Bell Rosson and extend |
---|
23 | 23 | | sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her children, Jeff |
---|
24 | 24 | | Rosson and his wife, Sabrina, Kenny Rosson and his fiancee, Sharon |
---|
25 | 25 | | McCloud, and Luann Langley and her husband, Bill; to her |
---|
26 | 26 | | grandchildren, Rachel Wood and her husband, Marcus, Garath Rosson |
---|
27 | 27 | | and his wife, Kara, Randi Boutwell and her friend, Scott Clark, and |
---|
28 | 28 | | Jerimy Bell and his wife, Stacie; to her great-grandchildren, Evan |
---|
29 | 29 | | and Anna Jae Wood and Tristin Bell; to her sister, Gwen Smith, and |
---|
30 | 30 | | her husband, Melvin; to her sisters-in-law, June Culbertson and |
---|
31 | 31 | | Patsy Jane Bell; to her brother-in-law, James Hugh Jones; and to her |
---|
32 | 32 | | other relatives and friends; and, be it further |
---|
33 | 33 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
34 | 34 | | prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
35 | 35 | | Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of |
---|
36 | 36 | | Patsy Rosson. |
---|
37 | 37 | | Homer |
---|
38 | 38 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
39 | 39 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
40 | 40 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 169 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
41 | 41 | | rising vote of the House on April 23, 2009. |
---|
42 | 42 | | ______________________________ |
---|
43 | 43 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
44 | 44 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 169 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
45 | 45 | | rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009. |
---|
46 | 46 | | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | 47 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | 48 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
49 | 49 | | Date |
---|
50 | 50 | | __________________ |
---|
51 | 51 | | Governor |
---|