Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR169 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 169


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Patsy
 Bell Rosson of Paris, Texas, who passed away on March 24, 2009, at
 the age of 74; and
 WHEREAS, Born on January 30, 1935, to Horace and Melva
 Hawkins Bell in Paris, Patsy Bell graduated from Paris High School
 in 1953; she married Walter Rosson on September 24, 1954, and the
 couple shared a fulfilling life together until Mr. Rosson passed
 away; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Rosson took great joy in spending time with her
 family, which grew to include three children, Jeff, Kenny, and
 Luann, four grandchildren, Rachel, Garath, Randi, and Jerimy, and
 three great-grandchildren, Evan, Anna, and Tristin; and
 WHEREAS, Patsy Rosson is deeply missed, and memories of her
 kindness and generosity will long be treasured by all those
 fortunate enough to have shared in the richness of her life; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Patsy Bell Rosson and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her children, Jeff
 Rosson and his wife, Sabrina, Kenny Rosson and his fiancee, Sharon
 McCloud, and Luann Langley and her husband, Bill; to her
 grandchildren, Rachel Wood and her husband, Marcus, Garath Rosson
 and his wife, Kara, Randi Boutwell and her friend, Scott Clark, and
 Jerimy Bell and his wife, Stacie; to her great-grandchildren, Evan
 and Anna Jae Wood and Tristin Bell; to her sister, Gwen Smith, and
 her husband, Melvin; to her sisters-in-law, June Culbertson and
 Patsy Jane Bell; to her brother-in-law, James Hugh Jones; and to her
 other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Patsy Rosson.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 169 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 23, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 169 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor