Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR170 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 170


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Jimmy E.
 Upton of Blossom, who passed away on March 24, 2009, at the age of
 64; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Dallas on July 20, 1944, to Bonnie and Claude
 Upton, Jimmy Upton lived in several different locations throughout
 the United States before settling in Paris, Texas, in the early
 1960s; he answered his nation's call to duty with service in the
 Vietnam War as a member of the 1st Infantry Division of the U.S.
 Army and earned two Bronze Stars; Mr. Upton married the love of his
 life, the former Billie E. Harris, in 1970, and the couple nurtured
 a rewarding marriage that was made even richer by the addition of
 three children and two grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Upton went to work as a welder for Babcock &
 Wilcox after returning from the war, and his career there spanned
 more than three decades; he also owned and operated his own
 automotive repair shop in Blossom for a number of years; in 1998, he
 retired from both occupations and shortly afterward went to work as
 an aircraft mechanic for L3 Communications; and
 WHEREAS, Known to his friends as "BoBo," Mr. Upton was a
 member of the Blossom Masonic Lodge and enjoyed hunting and fishing
 when not at work or spending time with his loved ones; although he
 will be deeply missed, Jimmy Upton leaves his family and friends
 with a wealth of fond memories that will be treasured long into the
 future; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Jimmy E. Upton and extend sincere
 sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Billie Upton; to
 his children, Michelle Bailey, Stephanie Gandy, and Jody Upton; to
 his grandchildren, Mallory Ackley and Jayden Upton; to his brother,
 Claude Upton; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Jimmy Upton.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 170 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 23, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 170 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor