E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/25/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4569
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4087
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#982
|
Journal Page: 4087
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4087
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#412
|
Journal Page: 2172
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1265
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|