E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5153 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6967 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6976 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6038 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 4740 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4740 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 4740 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 4739 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4739 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2893 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#1117 | Journal Page: 4585 |
House | 05/24/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4585 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4585 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4286 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1650 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Filed |