1 | 1 | | H.C.R. No. 190 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Residents of Northeast Texas lost a brave and |
---|
6 | 6 | | dedicated member of the community with the death of volunteer |
---|
7 | 7 | | firefighter Joe Pat Jordan on July 4, 2008, at the age of 71; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Jordan was an active member and the |
---|
9 | 9 | | secretary-treasurer of the Pickton-Pine Forest Volunteer Fire |
---|
10 | 10 | | Department, which he helped found in 1976; on July 2, 2008, he and |
---|
11 | 11 | | another firefighter were responding to a call when Mr. Jordan |
---|
12 | 12 | | suffered a heart attack shortly after leaving the station; and |
---|
13 | 13 | | WHEREAS, Born on January 26, 1937, to Maurice and Zelena |
---|
14 | 14 | | Jordan, Joe Pat Jordan worked as an electrician for 37 years and |
---|
15 | 15 | | retired from Verizon; he shared a long and fulfilling marriage with |
---|
16 | 16 | | his wife, Nell Jordan, with whom he raised three children; and |
---|
17 | 17 | | WHEREAS, Known throughout the area for his generosity of |
---|
18 | 18 | | spirit, Mr. Jordan was not only deeply involved in the development |
---|
19 | 19 | | of the fire department, but he also shared his time with the |
---|
20 | 20 | | cemetery committee and served for more than a decade as a board |
---|
21 | 21 | | member of the Como-Pickton Independent School District; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | WHEREAS, Members of the Pickton-Pine Forest Volunteer Fire |
---|
23 | 23 | | Department made a formal request to have Mr. Jordan's name added to |
---|
24 | 24 | | the Volunteer Firemen monument on the grounds of the State Capitol, |
---|
25 | 25 | | and the State Firemen's & Fire Marshals' Association of Texas |
---|
26 | 26 | | approved the request in March 2009; and |
---|
27 | 27 | | WHEREAS, Joe Pat Jordan carried out his duties with courage |
---|
28 | 28 | | and a selfless commitment to his fellow citizens, and the family, |
---|
29 | 29 | | friends, and colleagues of this remarkable man will forever carry |
---|
30 | 30 | | their memories of him close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it |
---|
31 | 31 | | RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
32 | 32 | | hereby pay tribute to volunteer firefighter Joe Pat Jordan and |
---|
33 | 33 | | extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife of |
---|
34 | 34 | | 52 years, Nell Jordan; to his children, Jeff Jordan, Carolyn |
---|
35 | 35 | | Woolverston, and Sharon Carr; to his 10 grandchildren and his |
---|
36 | 36 | | great-grandchild; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be |
---|
37 | 37 | | it further |
---|
38 | 38 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
39 | 39 | | prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
40 | 40 | | Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of |
---|
41 | 41 | | Joe Pat Jordan. |
---|
42 | 42 | | Homer |
---|
43 | 43 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
44 | 44 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
45 | 45 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 190 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
46 | 46 | | rising vote of the House on April 30, 2009. |
---|
47 | 47 | | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | 48 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
49 | 49 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 190 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
50 | 50 | | rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009. |
---|
51 | 51 | | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | 52 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
53 | 53 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
54 | 54 | | Date |
---|
55 | 55 | | __________________ |
---|
56 | 56 | | Governor |
---|