Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR190 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 190


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Residents of Northeast Texas lost a brave and
 dedicated member of the community with the death of volunteer
 firefighter Joe Pat Jordan on July 4, 2008, at the age of 71; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Jordan was an active member and the
 secretary-treasurer of the Pickton-Pine Forest Volunteer Fire
 Department, which he helped found in 1976; on July 2, 2008, he and
 another firefighter were responding to a call when Mr. Jordan
 suffered a heart attack shortly after leaving the station; and
 WHEREAS, Born on January 26, 1937, to Maurice and Zelena
 Jordan, Joe Pat Jordan worked as an electrician for 37 years and
 retired from Verizon; he shared a long and fulfilling marriage with
 his wife, Nell Jordan, with whom he raised three children; and
 WHEREAS, Known throughout the area for his generosity of
 spirit, Mr. Jordan was not only deeply involved in the development
 of the fire department, but he also shared his time with the
 cemetery committee and served for more than a decade as a board
 member of the Como-Pickton Independent School District; and
 WHEREAS, Members of the Pickton-Pine Forest Volunteer Fire
 Department made a formal request to have Mr. Jordan's name added to
 the Volunteer Firemen monument on the grounds of the State Capitol,
 and the State Firemen's & Fire Marshals' Association of Texas
 approved the request in March 2009; and
 WHEREAS, Joe Pat Jordan carried out his duties with courage
 and a selfless commitment to his fellow citizens, and the family,
 friends, and colleagues of this remarkable man will forever carry
 their memories of him close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to volunteer firefighter Joe Pat Jordan and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife of
 52 years, Nell Jordan; to his children, Jeff Jordan, Carolyn
 Woolverston, and Sharon Carr; to his 10 grandchildren and his
 great-grandchild; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Joe Pat Jordan.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 190 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 30, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 190 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor