E | 05/30/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6903 | |
E | 05/20/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4316 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3948 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2508 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1782 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2145 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2145 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1863 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Filed |