H.C.R. No. 191 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, A full and productive life drew to a close with the passing of educator William S. Long of Hopkins County on April 6, 2009, at the age of 96; and WHEREAS, The son of Samuel and Edith Long, "Pete" Long was born in Addran on January 25, 1913, and was a lifelong Hopkins County resident; after graduating from Sulphur Springs High School, he earned his bachelor's and master's degrees from East Texas State Teachers College in Commerce and began his career as the only instructor at a school in Macedonia; on June 1, 1935, he married the former Evelyn "Eva" Ruth Chapman, a fellow educator, and they later became the parents of four children; and WHEREAS, Mr. Long taught in Addran and Birthright and was instrumental in the consolidation of their schools in the North Hopkins Independent School District in the early 1940s; in addition, he taught aviation electronics as a civilian instructor at Sheppard Field during World War II; he served North Hopkins ISD as a teacher, coach, and principal before becoming superintendent, a position he held for 35 years; to the faculty and staff, he and his wife were "Mr. Pete" and "Miss Ruth", and the couple fostered a family atmosphere, organizing monthly restaurant outings and hosting Christmas parties at their home; and WHEREAS, A caring mentor and exemplary role model, Mr. Long encouraged participation in athletics, agriculture, and other activities, even chauffeuring students to basketball games and to livestock shows as far away as Houston; he won the lasting respect and admiration of his students, who continued to pay visits to the Longs at their home after they had retired; their son, Tommy, became district superintendent in 1988; and WHEREAS, In his retirement, Pete Long remained an enthusiastic fan of the North Hopkins Panthers and supported them with regular attendance at ball games; he was also a farmer and cattle rancher, and he and Mrs. Long enjoyed traveling together with friends and family until her death in 1999; and WHEREAS, This dedicated professional held lifetime memberships in the Parent-Teacher Association, the Texas State Teachers Association, the Texas Retired Teachers Association, and the Texas Association of School Administrators, and he served on the boards of the Hopkins County Civic Center and the Region VIII Service Center; and WHEREAS, Mr. Long was also an active member of his community, serving as chair of Sulphur Springs/Hopkins County Crime Stoppers and as a charter member of the local chapter of Golden K Kiwanis; among other civic contributions, he participated in the Rural Urban Organization, which named him Outstanding Citizen in 1986; his numerous other accolades included recognition as an Outstanding Older Texan by Governor Bill Clements; moreover, for nearly 70 years, he was a member of the Masonic Lodge in Sulphur Springs, and the Master Mason was also a valued member of North Hopkins Baptist Church, where he was a deacon and longtime Sunday school teacher; and WHEREAS, Pete Long left a lasting imprint on countless lives through his commitment to education and to his community, and memories of this beloved Texan will forever be treasured by all those who were fortunate enough to know him; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas hereby pay tribute to the life of William S. Long and extend deepest sympathy to the members of his family: to his sons, William Long and his wife, Georgie, Tommy Long and his wife, Carolyn, and Frank Long and his wife, Juli; to his daughter, Sammie Bedford; to his grandchildren, Julie, William, Kristin, John, Reid, Ami, and Sam Long, Shawn Brewer and his wife, Lauri, and Brian Brewer and his wife, Jeannie; to his great-grandchildren, Cara, Colton, Clay, Austin, Autumn, Kate, and Emma; to his sister, Margaret Glosup; to his sisters-in-law, Edna Grant and Agnes Chapman; to his brother-in-law, Harve Chapman, and his wife, Martha Kate; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of Pete Long. Homer ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 191 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on April 30, 2009. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 191 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor