E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/21/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4355 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4355 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3948 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2508 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1950 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2346 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2346 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2005 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Filed |