Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR197 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 197


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Residents of the community of Annona lost a trusted
 friend and neighbor with the passing of Paul Alford Middleton on
 April 10, 2009, at the age of 79; and
 WHEREAS, Paul Middleton was born in Rusk on August 2, 1929,
 the son of Jessie and Dora Jones Middleton; he answered his nation's
 call to duty with service in the U.S. Army and earned a living by
 running his own business; and
 WHEREAS, He and his wife, the former Ann Boykin, enjoyed a
 rewarding marriage; Mr. Middleton had one daughter, Stephanie
 Britt, and a stepson, Michael Boykin, and also took great pride in
 his two grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Although Paul Middleton will be deeply missed, he
 will long be remembered with great affection by those fortunate
 enough to have shared in the richness of his life; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Paul Alford Middleton and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Ann
 Boykin Middleton; to his daughter, Stephanie Britt; to his stepson,
 Michael Boykin; to his two grandchildren; to his sister, Eleanor
 Vaughn; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Paul Middleton.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 197 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 4, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 197 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor