Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR198 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 198


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the death of Hubert
 H. Wiley of Clarksville, who passed away on April 12, 2009, at the
 age of 77; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Fort Worth on October 10, 1931, Hubert Wiley
 was the son of Melvin and Syble Hamilton Wiley; he earned his living
 in the ranching business until his retirement; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Wiley wed the former Sue Bruner in 1984, and the
 couple enjoyed a rewarding marriage that extended for more than two
 decades; he enjoyed the love and support of a large family that
 included 3 sons, Roger, Ronnie, and Don, and 4 daughters, Sandra,
 Sharon, Jeannie, and Arnita, as well as 9 grandchildren and 11
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Hubert Wiley led a full and purposeful life, and he
 will always be remembered with great admiration and affection by
 all those who had the good fortune to know him; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Hubert H. Wiley and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Sue
 Bruner Wiley; to his children, Roger Wiley and his wife, Debra,
 Ronnie Wiley and his wife, Pattie, Don Duffee and his wife, Cindy,
 Sandra Joyner and her husband, Burt, Sharon Chance and her husband,
 Don, Jeannie McGuire and her husband, John, and Arnita Cavender and
 her husband, Ricki; to his grandchildren and great-grandchildren;
 to his siblings, Evelyn Broumley and her husband, Scotty, and
 Melvin Wiley, Jr., and his wife, Patsy; and to his other relatives
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Hubert Wiley.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 198 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 4, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 198 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor