E | 02/06/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 230 | |
E | 02/04/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 224 | |
Senate | 02/03/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 136 | |
House | 02/02/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 201 | |
House | 01/29/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 201 | |
House | 01/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 191 | |
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 66 | |
Senate | 01/27/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 38 | |
House | 01/27/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 58 | |
House | 01/27/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 58 | |
House | 01/21/2009 | Filed |