Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR202 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 202


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Dorthy
 Matthews of Mount Pleasant, who passed away on April 8, 2009, at the
 age of 73; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Avery on September 5, 1935, the former
 Dorthy Forsyth was the daughter of Horace and Sallie Caddenhead
 Forsyth; she became the wife of David Matthews, and the couple
 enjoyed a long and rewarding marriage; they were the parents of five
 children, Lynn, David, Dwayne, Sheila, and Charlotta, and with the
 passing years, Mrs. Matthews saw her family grow to include 18
 grandchildren and 38 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Matthews was a member of Choctaw Baptist Church
 for many years and worked as the manager of Perry Brothers; and
 WHEREAS, Although she is deeply missed, Dorthy Matthews led a
 caring and purposeful life, and she leaves her loved ones with many
 treasured memories of happy times spent in her company; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Dorthy Matthews and extend sincere
 sympathy to the members of her family: to her children, Lynn
 Matthews and his wife, Pam, David Neal Matthews and his wife,
 Sharon, Sheila Carter and her husband, Walter, and Charlotta Hughes
 and her husband, Ricky; to her grandchildren and
 great-grandchildren; to her siblings, Louis, Gary Don, James, and
 Joyce Forsyth; to her special friend, Rex Collins; and to her other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Dorthy Matthews.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 202 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 4, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 202 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor