Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR203 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 203


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Lessie
 Nelson of Mount Vernon, who passed away on April 5, 2009, at the age
 of 95; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Greenwood, Arkansas, on October 17, 1913,
 Lessie Nelson was the daughter of James F. Bartlett and Claria
 Boswell; she enjoyed a rewarding marriage with her husband, Dave,
 until his passing in 2006; the couple were blessed with a fine
 family that grew to include four children, Bettie, Buddy, Garry,
 and Veda Sue, as well as six grandchildren and numerous great- and
 great-great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Although Lessie Nelson is deeply missed, her loved
 ones may take comfort in memories of the many happy times that they
 spent in her company; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Lessie Nelson and extend sincere
 sympathy to the members of her family: to her children, Bettie
 Nelson, Milroy "Buddy" Nelson, Garry Nelson, and Veda Sue Nelson;
 to her grandchildren, great-grandchildren, and
 great-great-grandchildren; to her sisters, Ellen Cayton, Jewel
 Freeze, and Omega Smith; and to her other relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Lessie Nelson.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 203 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 4, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 203 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor