E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4642 | |
E | 05/15/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3954 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2411 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3716 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3173 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2224 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1951 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2345 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2345 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2125 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Filed |