H.C.R. No. 204 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, The Tyler Morning Telegraph is celebrating its centennial on November 18, 2009; and WHEREAS, Part of a long newspaper tradition, the Tyler Morning Telegraph is owned by the T. B. Butler Publishing Company, Inc., which has been run by the same family for five generations, starting on November 18, 1910, when Thomas Booker Butler purchased the Tyler Courier-Times, an afternoon newspaper formed in 1906 with the consolidation of the Daily Courier, founded in 1877 as a weekly, and the Weekly Times; and WHEREAS, Mr. Butler, a civic leader, businessman, and attorney, served one term as county judge of Smith County and filled an unexpired term as judge of the 7th Judicial District Court; he made his mark in many aspects of commerce, most notably as the founder and president of Guaranty State Bank and as publisher of the Courier-Times, where he fostered a pattern of community engagement; during his first four years at its helm, the paper successfully campaigned for the construction of a modern streetcar system and was instrumental in replacing an outmoded ward system with a city manager form of government; and WHEREAS, On November 14, 1929, Butler Publishing printed the first edition of the Tyler Morning Telegraph, which featured expanded coverage of East Texas cities, while the Courier-Times retained its focus on matters in Tyler; the Sunday paper was renamed the Tyler Courier-Times-Telegraph; eventually, the nationwide shift toward morning newspapers took its toll on the Courier-Times, and the company ceased publication of its afternoon newspaper in 1995; and WHEREAS, Through the years, members of the Butler family continued to guide Butler Publishing; Mr. Butler's daughter, Sarah Butler, was succeeded by her nephew, Calvin Clyde, Jr.; Mr. Clyde's son, Nelson Clyde III, began serving as president and publisher in 1990, while Nelson Clyde IV now serves as associate publisher; other family members involved in the paper's management include operations manager Andrew Clyde and board member Jim Bothwell; the paper's stability and continuity of vision are also represented by the remarkable tenures of two directors, W. E. "Buddy" Hendley, the business manager and treasurer, and Everett Taylor, editor-in-chief, who each joined the organization more than a half-century ago; and WHEREAS, The company has maintained its culture of quality, earning numerous awards in recent years for editorial excellence, public service, and philanthropy; in 2005, the Tyler Morning Telegraph received a Charles E. Green Award for breaking news from the Headliners Foundation of Texas, and it has won numerous journalism honors from the Texas Associated Press Managing Editors; the paper's coverage of the judicial process has been recognized multiple times with the Gavel Award from the Texas Bar Association, and Baylor University named the Butler Publishing Company the Texas Family Business of the Year for 2005 in the large-company division; the Better Business Bureau recognized the newspaper with a Torch Award for Marketplace Ethics, and in May 2008, the City of Tyler selected founder T. B. Butler as the second honoree in Tyler's Half-Mile of History; and WHEREAS, The enduring success of the T. B. Butler Publishing Company offers strong testimony to the business values and journalism standards that Thomas Booker Butler established and handed down to his descendants, and the 100th anniversary of the newspaper provides a fitting opportunity to recognize the history of the Butler family and the Tyler Morning Telegraph; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas hereby congratulate the Tyler Morning Telegraph on the occasion of its 100th anniversary and extend best wishes for continued success to all those associated with this venerable newspaper; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for the Tyler Morning Telegraph as an expression of high regard by the Texas House of Representatives and Senate. Berman Flynn Merritt Hughes Hopson ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 204 was adopted by the House on May 4, 2009, by a non-record vote. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 204 was adopted by the Senate on May 11, 2009, by a viva-voce vote. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor