E | 05/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
E | 05/13/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3680 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2317 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3680 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3173 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2201 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2201 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 2201 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2200 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2199 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3044 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2862 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Filed |