Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR218 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 218


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Hazel
 Keith Schmitter of Cooper, who passed away on April 22, 2009, at the
 age of 84; and
 WHEREAS, Born on December 5, 1924, to Louis Monroe and Pearl
 Owen Taylor, the former Hazel Taylor graduated from Cooper High
 School; she married Robert Edwin Schmitter in 1942, and the couple
 enjoyed a rewarding marriage until Mr. Schmitter passed away in
 1966; they were the parents of one son, Woodson Merrick Schmitter,
 who preceded his mother in death; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Schmitter worked for Sears, for Cantrell
 Chevrolet, and at the Cooper Review, in addition to spending 25
 years with Abernathy Chevrolet; she was a member of First United
 Methodist Church of Cooper and United Methodist Women as well as
 being a member and lay representative of the Delta County Public
 Library; and
 WHEREAS, Although she is deeply missed, Hazel Schmitter led a
 full and purposeful life, and she leaves her loved ones with
 countless happy recollections of the time they spent in her
 company; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Hazel Keith Schmitter and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her sisters, Laura
 Jo Taylor and Evelyn Cechan and her husband, Henry; and to her other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Hazel Schmitter.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 218 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 19, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 218 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor