Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR223 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 223


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Frank
 Weaver of Paris, Texas, who passed away on April 29, 2009, at the
 age of 100; and
 WHEREAS, Frank Weaver was born on August 20, 1908, to Calvin
 and Maud Meeks Weaver in Lamar County; he married the love of his
 life, the former Evelyn Campbell, in 1934, and the couple raised two
 daughters, Carolyn and Kay; through the years, they welcomed into
 their family five grandchildren and five great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Weaver owned and operated the Texas Furniture
 Store for 43 years before retiring in 1987, and he served as a
 director of the Retail Furniture Association; very active in his
 community, he was a 32nd degree Mason, a member of the Elks Lodge, a
 Gideon for 43 years, and a member of the Kiwanis for 50 years;
 moreover, he was a longtime congregant of First Presbyterian
 Church, where he served as an elder, trustee, and treasurer; in his
 leisure time, he and Mrs. Weaver enjoyed traveling, and they had the
 opportunity to visit many memorable sites around the world; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted man of faith and family throughout his
 long and rewarding life, Frank Weaver will be forever remembered
 with great admiration and affection by all those who held him dear;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Frank Weaver and extend sincere
 sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Evelyn Weaver;
 to his daughters, Carolyn Williams and her husband, George, and Kay
 McClure and her husband, Allen; to his grandchildren, Cindy
 Huddleston and her husband, Tommy, David McClure and his wife,
 Tracey, Steven McClure and his wife, Jenny, and Jill McClure and her
 fiance, Brian Genovese; to his great-grandchildren, Micah
 Huddleston and his wife, Tina, and Jordan, Scott, Caden, and Will
 McClure; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Frank Weaver.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 223 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 19, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 223 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor