Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR224 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 224


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The family and friends of Fredrick Michael Ford of
 Sulphur Springs were deeply saddened by his untimely passing on
 April 14, 2009, at the age of 50; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Hopkins County on August 3, 1958, Fred Ford
 was the son of Roosevelt and Mary Lois Ross Ford and the brother of
 Roberta; he graduated from Sulphur Springs High School; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Ford was employed by Borden Dairy Products as a
 machine operator, and he worked at Sand Point Mobile Home
 Manufacturing and other local businesses; he was a congregant of
 Mitchell Chapel Church of God in Christ; and
 WHEREAS, He was married to Anita Mosley and rejoiced in his
 treasured family, which includes 5 sons, 10 grandchildren, and a
 great-grandchild; and
 WHEREAS, Fred Ford lived a caring and purposeful life, and he
 will forever be remembered with deep affection by all who were
 fortunate enough to share in his love and friendship; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby honor the life of Fredrick Michael Ford and extend sincere
 condolences to the members of his family: to his sons, Myron Mosley,
 Fredrick O'Neal Ford, Tranameth Ford, Tearance Ford, and Corey Hall
 and his wife, Michelle; to his grandchildren, Yvonne, Dereck,
 Alexis, Trayvon, Makayla, Breanna, Aliecia, Jaques, Jeremiah, and
 Nasiah; to his great-grandchild, Mylah; to his sisters, Lonease
 Williams, Mary Taylor Jackson and her husband, William, Gloria Jean
 Hemphill and her husband, George, Brenda Hawell and her husband,
 James, and Freda Cash; and to his other relatives and friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Fredrick Michael Ford.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 224 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 224 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor