Senate | 05/26/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 3188 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4765 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4765 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4065 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Filed |