Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR229 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 229


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The untimely passing of Clayton Bradley Rogers of
 Canton on April 27, 2009, at the age of 26, has brought a tremendous
 loss to his loved ones; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Sulphur Springs, Clay Rogers was born to
 Bradley and Rachelle Rogers on September 15, 1982; he was an
 enthusiastic outdoorsman and spent much of his free time bass
 fishing on lakes in Texas and Arizona; and
 WHEREAS, Weekend trips to Lake Fork brought Mr. Rogers
 immense pleasure, and he spent many happy hours there competing in
 fishing tournaments with his father; in the winter, he relished
 hunting at the deer lease, and he gladly shared his knowledge of
 both sports with his younger brother; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to his family and his beloved wife,
 Allison, Mr. Rogers had a caring, generous, and optimistic nature,
 and he demonstrated profound appreciation for the people he loved
 and the simple things that gave him joy; and
 WHEREAS, Although no words can diminish the pain caused by a
 young life cut short, those who were fortunate enough to know Clay
 Rogers will hold him forever in their hearts and cherish his
 enduring gift of love and compassion; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Clayton Bradley Rogers and
 extend deepest sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife,
 Allison Rogers; to his parents, Bradley and Rachelle Rogers; to his
 sister and brother, Kenzi and Kaden Rogers; to his grandmothers,
 Sue Rogers and Ruth Morrison; and to his many other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Clayton Bradley Rogers.
 Homer
 Flynn
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 229 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 229 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor