Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR232 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 232


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, No words can diminish the pain of a young life cut
 short, and we join the loved ones of Dustin Dow Clements of North
 Hopkins in mourning his passing on April 26, 2009, at the age of 21;
 and
 WHEREAS, Born in Sulphur Springs on April 8, 1988, Dustin
 Clements graduated from North Hopkins High School; and
 WHEREAS, An avid softball player, Mr. Clements played for the
 Amateur Softball Association of America as well as for U-Trip; he
 was a member of Martin Springs Baptist Church; and
 WHEREAS, Although his life ended far too soon, the family and
 friends of this beloved young man may count themselves fortunate to
 have known him, and they will forever hold him close in their
 hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Dustin Dow Clements and extend
 deepest sympathy to the members of his family: to his parents, Edgar
 Clements, Jr., and Debbie Clements; to his sister, Ashley Clements;
 to his grandparents, Edith and Bill Jackson and Jerry Don Simpson;
 to his great-grandmother, Rosie Duckworth; to his nephew, Mason
 Clements; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Dustin Dow Clements.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 232 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 232 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor