Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR239 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 239


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The life of a devoted mother, grandmother, and
 friend drew to a close with the passing of Ruth Evelyn Burd of
 Paris, Texas, on May 4, 2009, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Born on July 24, 1921, in Howland to George and Laura
 Blankinship McNeal, the former Ruth McNeal grew up in the Paris
 area; she later moved to the Dallas Metroplex and lived there for
 many years before returning to Paris in 2004; throughout her life,
 she took great comfort in her spiritual faith and was a member of
 the Baptist church; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Burd was the mother of three daughters, Patsy
 Clark, Donna Jean Perry, and Elizabeth Ann Ables, who preceded her
 mother in death; with the passing years, Mrs. Burd had the good
 fortune to welcome 8 grandchildren, 12 great-grandchildren, and a
 great-great-grandchild into her family; and
 WHEREAS, Ruth Burd made a positive difference in the lives of
 many people during her long and purposeful life, and her loved ones
 will forever cherish fond memories of the time they spent in her
 company; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Ruth Evelyn Burd and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her children,
 Patsy Clark and her husband, Ray, and Donna Jean Perry and her
 husband, James; to her grandchildren, Elizabeth Williams, Ray Scott
 Clark, Jr., Larry Clark, Linda Glenn, Patti Torres, Michelle
 Zumwalt and her husband, John, Beth Moore, and Scott and Meg Perry;
 to her great-grandchildren and great-great-grandchild; and to her
 other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Ruth Burd.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 239 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 239 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor