Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR243 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 243


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The death of Stephanye Irene Sampley of Atascocita
 on April 5, 2009, at the age of 34, brought a profound loss to her
 family and friends; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Donald and Gayle Sampley, Stephanye
 Sampley was born in Dallas on February 22, 1975; a member of the
 charter class of Oaks Elementary School in Atascocita, she went on
 to graduate from Humble High School and to earn her bachelor's
 degree in interdisciplinary studies from Stephen F. Austin State
 University in 1997; and
 WHEREAS, That same year, Ms. Sampley began her career as an
 educator, teaching kindergarten at Hopper Primary School in the
 Goose Creek Consolidated District in east Harris County; she also
 worked at The Learning Tools, a teacher supply store in Atascocita;
 deeply committed to her chosen field, she served as president of the
 Goose Creek Association of Texas Professional Educators and as an
 officer of the Mu Pi chapter of Delta Kappa Gamma Society
 International, an honor society for female educators; and
 WHEREAS, When she was 10 years old, Ms. Sampley became a
 charter member of the Atascocita United Methodist Church, serving
 as an acolyte at its first worship service; she participated in the
 congregation's United Methodist Youth Fellowship and in the United
 Methodist Action Reach-Out Mission by Youth, and was a church camp
 counselor for more than a dozen years at Lakeview in Palestine;
 while in college, she was a loyal and valued member of the United
 Methodist Church Wesley Foundation and served on United Methodist
 Church Texas Conference committees as a collegiate delegate; and
 WHEREAS, Stephanye Sampley helped many children embark on the
 adventure of education, and in so doing, she had a lasting influence
 on their lives; although her time on this earth was far too brief,
 the memory of her engaging smile, her kindness, and the joyfulness
 of her faith will be forever treasured by all who were fortunate
 enough to know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Stephanye Irene Sampley and extend
 deepest sympathy to the members of her family: to her parents,
 Donald and Gayle Sampley; to her brothers, Travis Sampley and
 Stuart Sampley and his wife, Kelly; to her niece, Murphy Lucille
 Sampley; to her grandparents, Neal and Fran Galloway; and to her
 other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Stephanye Sampley.
 McReynolds
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 243 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 243 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 27, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor