Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR244 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 244


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of William
 Richard McCord of Sumner, who died on May 2, 2009, at the age of 90;
 and
 WHEREAS, Richard McCord was born in Detroit, Texas, on
 December 14, 1918, to Thomas Done and Ida Melton McCord; in 1941, he
 was joined in matrimony to his lifetime companion, the former
 Gertie Lee Martin, and they shared a fulfilling marriage until her
 death in 2005; and
 WHEREAS, Answering his nation's call to duty, Mr. McCord
 served in the U.S. Army Air Force during World War II; and
 WHEREAS, For most of his life, Mr. McCord lived in Lamar
 County, where he was self-employed and worked in dairy farming,
 cattle ranching, and hay baling; he lived in the Hopewell community
 for 34 years and was a member of the Bonham Street Church of Christ
 congregation; and
 WHEREAS, While his death has brought great sorrow to all
 those who knew him, memories of Richard McCord will be forever
 treasured by all who were privileged to share in his love and
 friendship; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of William Richard McCord and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his in-laws,
 Roy Gilbert, L.C. and Jeanie Martin, Jerry Martin, Gerald and Jean
 Martin, Mary Bray, Louise McGlothin, and Jeanette and Dan Wisely;
 to his nieces and nephews, Sandra and Jay Carter, Jeff Franklin,
 Rose Franklin, Justin Franklin, and Shirley and Leon Anderson; and
 to his other family and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 William Richard McCord.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 244 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 244 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor