Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR245 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 245


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The death of Shawn A. Edwards of Roxton on May 6,
 2009, at the age of 40, has brought a profound loss to the family and
 friends of this esteemed Texan; and
 WHEREAS, The son of the Reverend John Edwards and Georgia
 Edwards, "Tank" Edwards was born in Burlington, New Jersey, on
 December 13, 1968; a graduate of Greenville High School, he moved to
 Roxton with his family when his father assumed the pastorate of
 Roxton United Methodist Church; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Edwards married the former Lindsay Barnett in
 Roxton on April 13, 1995; the couple later became the parents of two
 daughters, and he was a devoted husband and father; the family
 attended Calvary Chapel of Paris together, and Mr. Edwards
 expressed his strong faith by serving in the school of ministry and
 as a servant leader; and
 WHEREAS, A metal fabricator and welder by trade, Mr. Edwards
 also loved music and inspired others with his beautiful voice; he
 played the drums and was learning to play the guitar; in addition,
 he was an avid fisherman; his caring nature and fine sense of humor
 endeared him to his many friends; and
 WHEREAS, Shawn Edwards demonstrated a deep commitment to his
 family and his faith, and although he will be deeply missed,
 memories of him will forever endure in the hearts of all those who
 held him dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Shawn A. Edwards and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Lindsay
 Edwards; to his daughters, Alyssa and Cassi Edwards; to his
 parents, the Reverend John Edwards and Georgia Edwards; to his
 sisters, Kelli Mabe and Kristi Bruce and her husband, Robert; to his
 grandfathers, George Brown and John Edwards; to his aunts, Ruthann
 Taylor and her husband, Scott, and Janet Edwards; to his uncle, Alan
 Brown, and his wife, Sandi; to his nephews, Nick Gallaway and Chase
 Hickman; to his nieces, Amanda Thomas and Hailey Hickman; to his
 mother-in-law, Eileen Hickman; to his brother-in-law and
 sister-in-law, Doug and Angie Hickman; and to his other relatives
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Shawn A. Edwards.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 245 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 245 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor