Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR249 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 249


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Clyde
 Donald Smith of Paris, Texas, who passed away on May 2, 2009, at the
 age of 69; and
 WHEREAS, Born on April 1, 1940, to Clyde and Ruby Phipps Smith
 in Lamar County, Don Smith graduated from Cunningham High School in
 1958 and answered his nation's call to duty with service in the U.S.
 Army, 49th Armored Division; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Smith married Nita Gordon in 1961, and the
 couple shared 47 rewarding years of life together; they raised a
 loving family that included a son, Nick, and a daughter-in-law,
 Rhonda, as well as two grandchildren, Shea and Trevor; and
 WHEREAS, An employee of the Campbell Soup Company before his
 retirement, Mr. Smith also worked as a cattle rancher; he belonged
 to the United Pentecostal Church, where he was a member of the board
 and head usher; and
 WHEREAS, Don Smith devoted himself to serving his country,
 his family, and his faith, and he leaves his loved ones with many
 treasured memories of the happy times they spent in his company;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Clyde Donald Smith and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Nita
 Smith; to his son, Nick Smith, and his wife, Rhonda; to his
 grandchildren, Shea and Trevor Smith; to his brother, Gene Smith,
 and his wife, Cecelia; to his sisters, Pauline Plott, Marie Yancy,
 and Cynthia Smith; to his sister-in-law and brother-in-law, Leta
 and Gary Holcomb; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Don Smith.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 249 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 249 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor