1 | 1 | | H.C.R. No. 253 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Lady Bird Johnson, one of the nation's most beloved |
---|
6 | 6 | | first ladies, passed away on July 11, 2007, at the age of 94; and |
---|
7 | 7 | | WHEREAS, Born on December 22, 1912, in Karnack, the former |
---|
8 | 8 | | Claudia Alta Taylor was the third child of Thomas Jefferson Taylor |
---|
9 | 9 | | and Minnie Pattillo Taylor, and she was dubbed "Lady Bird" by her |
---|
10 | 10 | | nursemaid as a toddler; when she was five, her mother died and her |
---|
11 | 11 | | Aunt Effie subsequently stepped in to help raise her; and |
---|
12 | 12 | | WHEREAS, She graduated in 1928 from Marshall High School and |
---|
13 | 13 | | attended Saint Mary's Episcopal School for Girls in Dallas before |
---|
14 | 14 | | enrolling at The University of Texas at Austin, where she earned a |
---|
15 | 15 | | bachelor's degree in history in 1933 and a bachelor's of journalism |
---|
16 | 16 | | with honors in 1934; her plans to become a newspaper reporter were |
---|
17 | 17 | | diverted after she met Lyndon Baines Johnson, who was visiting |
---|
18 | 18 | | Austin on business in his role as a congressional secretary; |
---|
19 | 19 | | remarking later that she felt like a moth drawn to a flame, she |
---|
20 | 20 | | married him on November 17, 1934, within 10 weeks of their first |
---|
21 | 21 | | date; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | WHEREAS, By 1937, Mrs. Johnson was on the campaign trail in |
---|
23 | 23 | | support of her husband's bid for a Congressional seat, and not five |
---|
24 | 24 | | years later she was running his office while he served in the U.S. |
---|
25 | 25 | | Navy during World War II; at the same time, she demonstrated her |
---|
26 | 26 | | business acumen by purchasing a faltering Austin radio station with |
---|
27 | 27 | | an inheritance from her mother; she revived the station with her |
---|
28 | 28 | | tireless oversight and eventually expanded it into a multi-million |
---|
29 | 29 | | dollar broadcasting company that included a television station, a |
---|
30 | 30 | | cable television system, and several radio stations; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | WHEREAS, Mrs. Johnson delivered stump speeches throughout |
---|
32 | 32 | | Texas in behalf of her husband's race for the U.S. Senate, and she |
---|
33 | 33 | | traveled more than 35,000 miles for the Kennedy/Johnson ticket, |
---|
34 | 34 | | including trips she organized with Ethel and Eunice Kennedy to |
---|
35 | 35 | | introduce Texans to the presidential candidate's family; following |
---|
36 | 36 | | the fateful turn of events that thrust her husband into the |
---|
37 | 37 | | presidency in November 1963, she stood by his side as he pushed a |
---|
38 | 38 | | bold and controversial agenda, and she later defended his policies |
---|
39 | 39 | | during a whistle-stop tour through the South, where she spoke with |
---|
40 | 40 | | characteristic calm to large and unruly crowds; breaking new ground |
---|
41 | 41 | | for a first lady when she campaigned on her own, there is no doubt |
---|
42 | 42 | | that she contributed to President Johnson's 1964 landslide victory, |
---|
43 | 43 | | which included six of the eight southern states that many expected |
---|
44 | 44 | | him to lose; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | WHEREAS, It was during Mrs. Johnson's second term as first |
---|
46 | 46 | | lady that she initiated a beautification project of the nation's |
---|
47 | 47 | | capital; raising public and private dollars and enlisting a team of |
---|
48 | 48 | | philanthropists and government officials, she guided the planting |
---|
49 | 49 | | of flowers and trees on the mall and in triangle parks all over the |
---|
50 | 50 | | city, and she pressed for several revitalization efforts; the local |
---|
51 | 51 | | actions were a prelude to what became the first major legislative |
---|
52 | 52 | | campaign ever commenced by a first lady; the Highway Beautification |
---|
53 | 53 | | Act of 1965 or, as it came to be known, "Lady Bird's Bill," called |
---|
54 | 54 | | for fewer billboards and junkyards along the highways and |
---|
55 | 55 | | dramatically improved the American landscape; and |
---|
56 | 56 | | WHEREAS, After returning to Texas in 1969, Mrs. Johnson |
---|
57 | 57 | | focused on enhancing her native state; she was the leading force |
---|
58 | 58 | | behind the development of a hike and bike trail in downtown Austin |
---|
59 | 59 | | that has become one of the city's most treasured public spaces, and |
---|
60 | 60 | | for 20 years she continued to encourage the beautification of the |
---|
61 | 61 | | state's roadways by recognizing highway districts for their use of |
---|
62 | 62 | | native plants and scenery; in 1982, on the occasion of her 70th |
---|
63 | 63 | | birthday, she founded the National Wildflower Research Center, |
---|
64 | 64 | | which was later renamed the Lady Bird Johnson Wildflower Center and |
---|
65 | 65 | | associated with The University of Texas at Austin; and |
---|
66 | 66 | | WHEREAS, Along the way, Mrs. Johnson published A White House |
---|
67 | 67 | | Diary, an edited version of the diary she kept as first lady, played |
---|
68 | 68 | | a key role in planning for the LBJ Library and Museum and the LBJ |
---|
69 | 69 | | School of Public Affairs, served as a member of The University of |
---|
70 | 70 | | Texas System Board of Regents, and remained actively involved in |
---|
71 | 71 | | the LBJ Holding Company; although she lost President Johnson in |
---|
72 | 72 | | early 1973, the energy and passion with which she accomplished so |
---|
73 | 73 | | much recalled the momentum of the man who had swept her off her feet |
---|
74 | 74 | | decades earlier; her life was further enriched by her two |
---|
75 | 75 | | daughters, Lynda Bird and Luci Baines, who were born while their |
---|
76 | 76 | | father was a congressman, and by her numerous grandchildren and |
---|
77 | 77 | | great-grandchildren; and |
---|
78 | 78 | | WHEREAS, Wholly committed to improving the world around her, |
---|
79 | 79 | | Lady Bird Johnson set an inspiring example of leadership and |
---|
80 | 80 | | vision, and her gentle kindness touched more lives than she could |
---|
81 | 81 | | ever know; of her enduring achievements, the miles and miles of |
---|
82 | 82 | | colorful wildflowers that brighten our cities and countryside |
---|
83 | 83 | | perhaps best evoke the memory of this exceptional woman; now, |
---|
84 | 84 | | therefore, be it |
---|
85 | 85 | | RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
86 | 86 | | hereby pay tribute to the remarkable life of Lady Bird Johnson; and, |
---|
87 | 87 | | be it further |
---|
88 | 88 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
89 | 89 | | prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
90 | 90 | | Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of |
---|
91 | 91 | | Lady Bird Johnson. |
---|
92 | 92 | | McCall |
---|
93 | 93 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
94 | 94 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
95 | 95 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 253 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
96 | 96 | | rising vote of the House on May 28, 2009. |
---|
97 | 97 | | ______________________________ |
---|
98 | 98 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
99 | 99 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 253 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
100 | 100 | | rising vote of the Senate on May 29, 2009. |
---|
101 | 101 | | ______________________________ |
---|
102 | 102 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
103 | 103 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
104 | 104 | | Date |
---|
105 | 105 | | __________________ |
---|
106 | 106 | | Governor |
---|