Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR253 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 253


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Lady Bird Johnson, one of the nation's most beloved
 first ladies, passed away on July 11, 2007, at the age of 94; and
 WHEREAS, Born on December 22, 1912, in Karnack, the former
 Claudia Alta Taylor was the third child of Thomas Jefferson Taylor
 and Minnie Pattillo Taylor, and she was dubbed "Lady Bird" by her
 nursemaid as a toddler; when she was five, her mother died and her
 Aunt Effie subsequently stepped in to help raise her; and
 WHEREAS, She graduated in 1928 from Marshall High School and
 attended Saint Mary's Episcopal School for Girls in Dallas before
 enrolling at The University of Texas at Austin, where she earned a
 bachelor's degree in history in 1933 and a bachelor's of journalism
 with honors in 1934; her plans to become a newspaper reporter were
 diverted after she met Lyndon Baines Johnson, who was visiting
 Austin on business in his role as a congressional secretary;
 remarking later that she felt like a moth drawn to a flame, she
 married him on November 17, 1934, within 10 weeks of their first
 date; and
 WHEREAS, By 1937, Mrs. Johnson was on the campaign trail in
 support of her husband's bid for a Congressional seat, and not five
 years later she was running his office while he served in the U.S.
 Navy during World War II; at the same time, she demonstrated her
 business acumen by purchasing a faltering Austin radio station with
 an inheritance from her mother; she revived the station with her
 tireless oversight and eventually expanded it into a multi-million
 dollar broadcasting company that included a television station, a
 cable television system, and several radio stations; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Johnson delivered stump speeches throughout
 Texas in behalf of her husband's race for the U.S. Senate, and she
 traveled more than 35,000 miles for the Kennedy/Johnson ticket,
 including trips she organized with Ethel and Eunice Kennedy to
 introduce Texans to the presidential candidate's family; following
 the fateful turn of events that thrust her husband into the
 presidency in November 1963, she stood by his side as he pushed a
 bold and controversial agenda, and she later defended his policies
 during a whistle-stop tour through the South, where she spoke with
 characteristic calm to large and unruly crowds; breaking new ground
 for a first lady when she campaigned on her own, there is no doubt
 that she contributed to President Johnson's 1964 landslide victory,
 which included six of the eight southern states that many expected
 him to lose; and
 WHEREAS, It was during Mrs. Johnson's second term as first
 lady that she initiated a beautification project of the nation's
 capital; raising public and private dollars and enlisting a team of
 philanthropists and government officials, she guided the planting
 of flowers and trees on the mall and in triangle parks all over the
 city, and she pressed for several revitalization efforts; the local
 actions were a prelude to what became the first major legislative
 campaign ever commenced by a first lady; the Highway Beautification
 Act of 1965 or, as it came to be known, "Lady Bird's Bill," called
 for fewer billboards and junkyards along the highways and
 dramatically improved the American landscape; and
 WHEREAS, After returning to Texas in 1969, Mrs. Johnson
 focused on enhancing her native state; she was the leading force
 behind the development of a hike and bike trail in downtown Austin
 that has become one of the city's most treasured public spaces, and
 for 20 years she continued to encourage the beautification of the
 state's roadways by recognizing highway districts for their use of
 native plants and scenery; in 1982, on the occasion of her 70th
 birthday, she founded the National Wildflower Research Center,
 which was later renamed the Lady Bird Johnson Wildflower Center and
 associated with The University of Texas at Austin; and
 WHEREAS, Along the way, Mrs. Johnson published A White House
 Diary, an edited version of the diary she kept as first lady, played
 a key role in planning for the LBJ Library and Museum and the LBJ
 School of Public Affairs, served as a member of The University of
 Texas System Board of Regents, and remained actively involved in
 the LBJ Holding Company; although she lost President Johnson in
 early 1973, the energy and passion with which she accomplished so
 much recalled the momentum of the man who had swept her off her feet
 decades earlier; her life was further enriched by her two
 daughters, Lynda Bird and Luci Baines, who were born while their
 father was a congressman, and by her numerous grandchildren and
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Wholly committed to improving the world around her,
 Lady Bird Johnson set an inspiring example of leadership and
 vision, and her gentle kindness touched more lives than she could
 ever know; of her enduring achievements, the miles and miles of
 colorful wildflowers that brighten our cities and countryside
 perhaps best evoke the memory of this exceptional woman; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the remarkable life of Lady Bird Johnson; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Lady Bird Johnson.
 McCall
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 253 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 28, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 253 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 29, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor