E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5153 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6967 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6976 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6038 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 4741 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4741 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 4740 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 4740 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4740 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2893 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Record vote | RV#1128 | Journal Page: 4668 |
House | 05/25/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4668 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4668 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Filed |