Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR262 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 262


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Martha
 Sue Brunson of Paris, Texas, who passed away on May 14, 2009, at the
 age of 75; and
 WHEREAS, A native Texan, the former Martha McGinnis was born
 on August 3, 1933, in Roxton, to John and Lottie Margraves McGinnis;
 a graduate of her hometown's schools, she was a member of the
 Baptist church and a lover of music; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Brunson held a long and rewarding career at
 Sears, where she made many friends in both her coworkers and her
 customers; after retiring, she went on to work as a caregiver; and
 WHEREAS, The devoted mother of two sons, Mrs. Brunson later
 delighted in welcoming into her treasured family her
 daughters-in-law, three grandsons, two step-grandsons, and five
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, A kind and caring woman, Martha Sue Brunson earned
 the affection of all who knew her with her optimism, her
 ever-present smile, and her genuine interest in others; although
 she will be deeply missed, her loved ones can take comfort in
 knowing that she enjoyed a life that was rich in the intangibles
 that matter most; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Martha Sue Brunson and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of her family: to her sons,
 Ronnie Brunson and his wife, Treva, and Rickey Brunson and his wife,
 Marty; to her grandsons and their spouses, Ryan and Darla Brunson,
 Eric and Krisi Brunson, and Colby and Tricia Brunson; to her
 step-grandsons, Kenneth Musick and his wife, Mary, and Michael
 Musick and his wife, JoAnna; to her great-grandchildren, Holly
 Thompson, Allix, Tanner, and Lyric Brunson, and Lucas Musick; to
 the father of her children, Royce Brunson; and to her many other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Martha Sue Brunson.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 262 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 28, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 262 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor