E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5153 | |
House | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6967 | |
House | 06/02/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6976 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6973 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 5122 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5122 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 5122 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 5122 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5121 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 4192 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5196 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#1386 | Journal Page: 5196 |
House | 05/28/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5196 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5195 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 5146 | |
House | 05/26/2009 | Filed |