E | 03/06/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 614 | |
E | 03/05/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 385 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 554 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 577 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 373 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 373 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 373 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 373 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 332 | |
House | 02/02/2009 | Filed |