E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5153 | |
House | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6967 | |
House | 06/02/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6976 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6974 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 5105 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | HB 3613 | Journal Page: 5105 |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 5105 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 5104 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 5091 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 6916 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 6915 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 6914 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Filed |