E | 04/03/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1093 | |
E | 03/24/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 920 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 661 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 859 | |
House | 03/20/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 860 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 598 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 503 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 417 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 563 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 563 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 333 | |
House | 02/04/2009 | Filed |