Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR40 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 40


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Kenneth
 Helm of Sumner, who died on December 31, 2008, at the age of 78; and
 WHEREAS, Kenneth Helm was born to Abner and Corinne Copening
 Helm on October 24, 1930, and grew up in Direct; after graduating
 from Direct High School in 1948, he attended Paris Junior College;
 and
 WHEREAS, Answering his nation's call to duty during the
 Korean War, he enlisted in the U.S. Air Force in 1951 and served for
 four years; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Helm returned to Direct after his discharge from
 the military and joined Uarco, Inc.; following a 31-year tenure
 with that company, he retired in 1986 and opened an auto salvage
 service, which he operated from 1987 to 1999; he was a volunteer
 firefighter in the early years of the Direct Volunteer Fire
 Department; and
 WHEREAS, Throughout his life, Mr. Helm was also a rancher,
 and he was widely respected as a jack-of-all-trades, capable of
 handling any job that needed doing; and
 WHEREAS, Kenneth Helm worked hard all his life and made his
 own way in the world, and he will forever be remembered with deep
 affection by all who knew and loved him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Kenneth Helm and extend sincere
 condolences to the members of his family: to his former spouse,
 Billie McCann Helm; to his daughter, Lana Beth; to his son, Kenny;
 to his former daughter-in-law, Sue Jamerson; to his brothers, Jerry
 Delbert Helm and his wife, Inez, V. Donald Helm, and Wayne Helm and
 his wife, Ann; to his sister, Elsie Parson; and to his other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Kenneth Helm.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 40 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on February 11, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 40 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor