E | 05/06/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2871 | |
E | 04/24/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1930 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1420 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1868 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1296 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 251 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 290 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 290 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Filed |